Dogfen lywodraethu NATWEST SOCIAL & COMMUNITY CAPITAL
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/12/1999 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25/09/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/08/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23/10/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 JUN 2017 as amended on 21 Dec 2019 as amended on 21 Dec 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE THROUGHOUT ENGLAND, SCOTLAND AND WALES AND SUCH OTHER COUNTRIES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE AS SHALL EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE.
Maes buddion
SHROPSHIRE, HEREFORD AND WORCESTER, WARWICKSHIRE, STAFFORDSHIRE AND THE UNITARY AUTHORITIES OF STOKE-ON-TRENT, WOLVERHAMPTON, WASALL, SANDWELL, DUDLEY, BIRMINGHAM, SOLIHULL.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.