Trustees WWF - UK
Charity number: 1081247

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Rhian-Mari Thomas | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
David John Barnes | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bernard Josiah Barlow | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jessica Aywa Omukuti | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Steve Waygood | Trustee | 18 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janine Kirsty Brimelow KC | Trustee | 18 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dorcas Wongai Gwata | Trustee | 18 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
David John Lewis | Trustee | 18 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Baroness Bryony Katherine Worthington | Trustee | 31 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Hay | Trustee | 24 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Justin Rupert John Hainault Mundy | Trustee | 10 December 2018 |
|
|||||
Steven Morris | Trustee | 02 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR ELEANOR JANE MILNER-GULLAND MA PHD | Trustee | 21 June 2017 |
|
|||||
ANDREW JAMES GREEN | Trustee | 21 June 2017 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.