Accounts and annual returns SOUTH ASIAN DIASPORA LITERATURES AND ARTS ARCHIVE (SALIDAA)

Charity number: 1081584
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 05 July 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 October 2020 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 05 July 2019 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 25 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 17 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 15 February 2017 On time Download Open in new window