Accounts and annual returns BEDFORD CENTRAL JAMEE MASJID AND ISLAMIC CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity number: 1081598
Charity reporting is overdue by 54 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 54 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 54 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 12 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 12 January 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 03 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 03 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 25 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 25 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 12 June 2019 28 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 12 June 2019 28 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window