Financial history THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR SEED SCIENCE

Charity number: 1081225
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.00k £1.97k £1.75k £3.53k £3.20k
Total expenditure £6.18k £2.01k £3.31k £6.24k £59
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A