SCHOOL-HOME SUPPORT SERVICE (UK)

Charity number: 1084696
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £2.70m £2.77m £2.55m £2.33m £2.09m
Total expenditure £3.08m £2.69m £2.57m £2.33m £2.08m
Income from government contracts £500.98k £1.60m £1.47m £223.00k £186.41k
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £799.65k £1.09m £1.07m £1.26m £1.28m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.89m £1.67m £1.47m £1.07m £808.11k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £9.97k £9.87k £7.55k £0 £2.39k
Income - Other £0 £0 £930 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £1.07m £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.76m £2.49m £2.31m £1.99m £1.82m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £202.96k £261.50k £342.56k £262.55k
Expenditure - Governance £62.22k £34.63k £0 £0 £13.56k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0