SCHOOL-HOME SUPPORT SERVICE (UK)

Charity number: 1084696
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carly Janine Wickham Trustee 09 May 2019 None on record
Michelle Claire Loughrey Trustee 22 April 2020 None on record
Nikolai Petrou Trustee 22 April 2020 None on record
Colin Richard Horswell Trustee 19 February 2016 None on record
Sara Luder Trustee 15 January 2016 None on record
Laura Naomi Bruce Trustee 22 April 2020 None on record
Lisa Claire Robinson Trustee 19 February 2016 None on record
Lynne Jane Chambers Trustee 09 May 2019 None on record
John Philip Harold Patience Jeffcock Trustee 21 February 2016 None on record
Paul Frederick Sharrock Chair 01 January 2019 None on record
Mariella Susan Ardron Trustee 22 April 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST WITH ST MARY THE VIRGIN, ISLEWORTH Received: On time
DAVID JACK MARRIAGE Trustee 21 February 2013 None on record