THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST JOHN CHRYSOSTOM IN CHELTENHAM AND ENVIRONS

Charity number: 1083808
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 March 2018 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 29 March 2017 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 29 March 2017 57 days late Download