THE SUNNYBANK TRUST

Charity number: 1085978
Removed charity
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 9 MARCH 2001, AS AMENDED ON 9TH MARCH 2001 AND 22ND OCTOBER 2009.
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS (''THE OBJECTS'') THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF AN AREA WITHIN 6 MILES OF THE BOUNDARY OF EPSOM AND EWELL BOROUGH COUNCIL. ('' HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT'').
Organisation type
Other
Registration history
  • 30 March 2001 : registered
  • 13 November 2012 : removed (FUNDS TRANSFERRED (INCOR))
Other names
  • THE SUNNYBANK TRUST (Working name)
  • THE EBBISHAM ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
What the charity did
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helped
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helped
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information