ACCRA ACADEMY OLD BOYS' ASSOCIATION (UK)

Charity number: 1084860
Removed charity
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 JULY 2000
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS ATTENDING ACCRA ACADEMY, ACCRA, GHANA BY THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND AMENITIES.
Organisation type
No information available
Registration history
  • 01 February 2001 : registered
  • 27 August 2009 : removed (DOES NOT OPERATE)
  • 10 April 2019 : re-registered
  • 09 September 2019 : removed (DOES NOT OPERATE)
Other names

No other names

What the charity did
  • Education/training
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
Who the charity helped
  • Children/young People
How the charity helped
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body