YAD VOEZER DAY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1087196
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £186.08k £119.34k £31.95k £124.12k £707.08k
Total expenditure £260.38k £69.46k £52.47k £57.04k £28.63k
Income from government contracts £42.42k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £10.54k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £630.06k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £77.00k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £15
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £4
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £28.63k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £4.75k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0