Financial history THURROCK ISLAMIC EDUCATION AND CULTURAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1088656
Charity reporting is overdue by 15 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £40.83k £44.75k £52.62k £57.78k £141.52k
Total expenditure £17.81k £31.28k £30.05k £38.87k £35.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A