ST. MARY'S PARISH CENTRE (AMBLESIDE) TRUST

Charity number: 1093947
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 February 2021 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 February 2021 371 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 03 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 11 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required