BINGHAM AMATEUR OPERATIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Musicals, concerts and pantos for the community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 16 January 2002: Standard registration
- BINGHAM MUSICAL THEATRE COMPANY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Green | Chair | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Emily Hudson | Trustee | 31 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Nik Hudson | Trustee | 31 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ben Bradley | Trustee | 31 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Richards | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Ellen Loran | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alicia Richardson | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Celia Bolstridge | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emma Townsend | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEVE WARRINER | Trustee | 01 September 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.73k | £873 | £0 | £1.03k | £7.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.20k | £856 | £67 | £485 | £4.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 25 March 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 APRIL 2001 AS AMENDED 5 NOVEMBER 2001.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE DRAMATIC ARTS AND TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE PUBLIC APPRECIATION IN THE SAID ARTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 CAMPION WAY
BINGHAM
NOTTINGHAM
NG13 8TR
- Phone:
- 01949831615
- Email:
- bmtc@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window