Accounts and annual returns WHITECROSS VILLAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1086854

Charity reporting is overdue by 1526 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 65 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 65 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 430 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 430 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 795 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 795 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1160 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1160 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2018 | Overdue | Overdue by 1526 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2018 | Overdue | Overdue by 1526 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window