Accounts and annual returns THE COUNCIL OF EUROPEAN JAMAATS

Charity number: 1096111
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 December 2019 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 December 2019 48 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 11 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 11 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 30 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 30 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window