LEGAL ACTION

Charity number: 1100780
Charity is insolvent
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020
Annual return 31 March 2019
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019
Annual return 31 March 2018
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018
Annual return 31 March 2017
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017
Annual return 31 March 2016
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016