THE THOMLEY HALL CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1089224
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 07 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 15 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 03 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 03 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 22 June 2017 On time Download