Dogfen lywodraethu CARDIFF AND VALE CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/09/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/02/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/03/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08/08/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27 MAR 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30 MAR 2017 as amended on 11 Jan 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3 Objects 3.1 The Charity?s objects are to promote any charitable purpose for the public benefit by the advancement of education, the protection and preservation of health and the relief of poverty, sickness and distress in particular, but without limitation, for the benefit of the community principally Cardiff and the Vale of Glamorgan, and surrounding areas, but in general for the whole of the UK.
Maes buddion
THE WHOLE OF ENGLAND AND WALES, PRINCIPALLY CARDIFF AND THE VALE OF GLAMORGAN, AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.