Accounts and annual returns NETWORK M.E.
Charity number: 1090038
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2009 | 06 July 2009 | On time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2008 | 02 July 2008 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2008 | 02 July 2008 | On time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2007 | 11 January 2008 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2007 | 13 June 2007 | On time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2006 | 25 January 2007 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2006 | 25 July 2006 | On time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window