LONDON GRID FOR LEARNING TRUST

Charity number: 1090412
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £23.14m £25.84m £26.94m £26.18m £28.12m
Total expenditure £23.03m £23.27m £25.44m £26.09m £30.51m
Income from government contracts £0 £5.00m £565.00k £4.13m £4.88m
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £23.12m £4.47m £5.07m £4.13m £4.88m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £21.36m £21.86m £22.00m £22.23m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £23.60k £7.00k £11.00k £44.00k £47.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £967.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £23.03m £19.24m £20.64m £22.02m £25.77m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £4.03m £4.80m £4.07m £4.74m
Expenditure - Governance £99.35k £62.00k £59.00k £64.00k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £1 £0 £0 £0 £0