LONDON GRID FOR LEARNING TRUST

Charity number: 1090412
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nicholas Mitchell Trustee 29 September 2010 None on record
PAUL ANTHONY ROBINSON Chair None on record
HELEN WARNER Trustee 17 December 2012 None on record
Sara Miriam Preece Williams Trustee 13 March 2018 None on record
Dr Jane Elizabeth Georgeson McSherry Trustee 23 March 2018 None on record
SEAN GREEN Trustee 01 July 2016 None on record
GARY HIPPLE Trustee None on record