Trustees BRADFORD TRIDENT LIMITED
Charity number: 1107561
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TAJ SALAM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Imran YOUNAS | Trustee | 05 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Noor Elahi | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
ISHAQ SHAFIQ | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|||||
JAVED KHAN | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|||||
NIAZ HUSSIAN ALI | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Ramen Haire | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Yaqoob Ayoob | Trustee | 21 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Hawarun Hussain | Trustee | 26 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sadaqat Ali Khan | Trustee | 07 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED SAEED AFSAR | Trustee | 20 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
SARAH HINTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHAHZADA MEER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FAREEDA MIR | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.