Accounts and annual returns ACTION ON DISABILITY

Charity number: 1091518
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 08 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 03 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 12 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 08 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 02 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window