Accounts and annual returns SEVERN VALLEY RAILWAY CHARITABLE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1092723
Charity reporting is overdue by 55 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 55 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 55 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 28 April 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 28 April 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 24 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 24 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 23 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 23 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 01 May 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 01 May 2020 1 days late Download Open in new window