BRADFORD RAPE CRISIS AND SEXUAL ABUSE SURVIVORS SERVICE

Charity number: 1091732
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alison Berkeley-Hill Chair 15 December 2017 None on record
Dafina Pirra Trustee 17 January 2022 None on record
LISA MARI HILDER Trustee
PURPLE HOUSE NURSERIES Received: On time
ANGIE CARRINGTON Trustee 16 March 2012 None on record
Fatima Mahmood Trustee 18 October 2021 None on record
Karen Louise Raynor Trustee 21 January 2019 None on record