Trustees EXETER CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 1091143
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DENNIS JOHN MARDON Chair
THE CREDITON HEART PROJECT
Received: On time
Natalia Trinca Trustee 29 September 2021
None on record
Joseph Robert Oliver Trustee 29 September 2021
None on record
Ruth Lowe Trustee 29 September 2021
None on record
Kim Marie McDonald Trustee 23 June 2021
None on record
Amy Langford Trustee 18 April 2019
None on record
Stephen John Morgan Trustee 27 March 2019
None on record
Marilyn Carol Whitton Trustee 16 January 2019
None on record
GORDON THOMAS RICHARDSON Trustee 19 April 2017
None on record
lesley pattison Trustee 21 November 2011
TOPSHAM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Received: On time
DEREK PHILLIPS Trustee
ROYAL ALBERT MEMORIAL MUSEUM DEVELOPMENT APPEAL
Received: On time
STEPHEN SALTER Trustee
None on record