Trustees PEOPLE TO PLACES
Charity number: 1091387
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Frances Maria Basley | Chair | 19 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Jane Helen Hughes | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Giles Ballard | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Greensmith | Trustee | 03 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Scott MacRae | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Berg | Trustee | 05 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
BRUCE IAN ROSS ADAMS | Trustee | 07 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gill Godbold BSC, PGCE, FRSA | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.