LEEDS ASYLUM SEEKERS SUPPORT NETWORK

Charity number: 1092647
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 February 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 February 2021 9 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 15 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 06 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 06 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 04 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 04 August 2016 On time Download