Dogfen lywodraethu WINDLE TRUST INTERNATIONAL
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/09/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/01/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/06/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/09/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/04/2011 as amended on 25 Jun 2019 as amended on 02 Oct 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF REFUGEES, INTERNALLY DISPLACED PEOPLE, OTHER PEOPLE AFFECTED BY OR AT RISK FROM CONFLICT AND NATURAL DISASTER AND THE HOST POPULATIONS OF ANY SUCH PEOPLE; 2. TO AID PEOPLE IN THE WORLD NEEDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE; 3. TO ESTABLISH AND/OR SUPPORT EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD; 4. TO RELIEVE AND CARE FOR PEOPLE SUFFERING ILLNESS; 5. TO ESTABLISH AND/OR SUPPORT HOSPITALS OR OTHER MEDICAL INSTITUTIONS; 6. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH; 7. TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND DISTRESS; 8. TO PROVIDE VOCATIONAL SKILLS TRAINING AND WORK PLACEMENTS, IN PARTICULAR FOR THE PERSONS NAMED AT 1. ABOVE, AND 9. TO FURTHER ANY OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSE BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY.
Maes buddion
WORLDWIDE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.