AFGHAN HUMAN RIGHTS ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1099550
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 19 December 2019 27 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 19 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 19 December 2018 27 February 2020 131 days late
Accounts and TAR 19 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 19 December 2017 07 December 2018 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 19 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 19 December 2016 15 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 19 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 19 December 2015 12 December 2016 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 19 December 2015 Not Required