BARNABAS FUND

Charity number: 1092935
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 26 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 12 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 12 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 15 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 15 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 11 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 11 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 15 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 15 March 2017 On time Download