Trustees SWANSEA AND BRECON DIOCESAN BOARD FOR SOCIAL RESPONSIBILITY
Charity number: 1095035
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE VENERABLE ALAN NEIL JEVONS | Chair | 10 December 2013 |
|
|||||||||||
Richard Davies | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Bethan Thomas | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Martin Philip Jones | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Jane Parker | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Helen Rebecca Bowden | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Jessica Jane Harrington | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Karen Jayne Grunhut | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Ian Drew-Jones | Trustee | 29 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
John Edward Meredith | Trustee | 30 July 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
JULIAN LOVELL | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
NIGEL EDWARD KING | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
ESTHER SEARLE | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
Rev ROBERT JOHN DAVIES - HANNEN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.