Accounts and annual returns BRITISH SOMALI COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1099490
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 02 February 2019 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 02 February 2019 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 01 February 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 01 February 2018 1 days late Download Open in new window