Financial history BRITISH SOMALI COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1099490
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £72.23k £78.68k £93.67k £128.48k £159.03k
Total expenditure £104.07k £76.78k £125.28k £103.68k £86.87k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £31.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £58.75k £31.00k N/A £8.00k