Accounts and annual returns DORSET ADVOCACY

Charity number: 1096040
Charity is insolvent
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023
Annual return 31 March 2022
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022
Annual return 31 March 2021
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window