BRITISH KERALITES ASSOCIATION (BKA)

Charity number: 1108424
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 10 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 01 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required