CATHOLIC TRUST FOR ENGLAND AND WALES

Charity number: 1097482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.05m £6.51m £7.70m £9.71m £13.38m
Total expenditure £5.13m £6.97m £7.81m £9.98m £11.94m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £5.23m £4.95m £5.07m £6.07m £10.44m
Income - Other trading activities £23.17k £323.55k £1.22m £1.14m £962.24k
Income - Charitable activities £127.10k £155.79k £206.19k £1.32m £857.08k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £459.39k £739.20k £988.96k £883.04k £630.53k
Income - Other £209.29k £344.79k £208.84k £302.55k £491.33k
Income - Legacies £80.94k £6.02k £248.27k £260.12k £128.68k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.95m £6.34m £6.62m £8.92m £10.89m
Expenditure - Raising funds £184.63k £309.19k £547.96k £265.08k £288.05k
Expenditure - Governance £26.77k £22.33k £25.16k £17.98k £17.57k
Expenditure - Grants institution £599.57k £778.57k £35.23k £8.71m £4.08m
Expenditure - Investment management £118.13k £237.88k £234.99k £213.91k £172.21k
Expenditure - Other £0 £319.04k £634.20k £790.20k £764.85k