Accounts and annual returns STRUCTURAL GENOMICS CONSORTIUM

Charity number: 1097737
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 18 October 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 05 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 05 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 20 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 20 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 22 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 22 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 11 June 2020 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window