INTERNATIONAL PLENITUDE MINISTRIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the christian faith
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income includes £30,378 from 1 government grant(s)
People
4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
- Brazil
- France
- Greece
- Italy
- Portugal
- Spain
- United States
Governance
- 11 March 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bishop EDELMAR MESSIAS CANDIDO | Chair |
|
|
|||||
LUCAS MENEZES ROSA SOARES DA FONSECA | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
CARMEN MARIA PEREIRA MESSIAS | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANDREA REGINA MERENDA DA MATA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £316.73k | £253.05k | £180.83k | £197.24k | £198.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £328.60k | £250.46k | £168.52k | £171.86k | £217.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £56.29k | £48.25k | £33.37k | £21.98k | £30.38k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 March 2023 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 March 2023 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 February 2021 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 February 2021 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 23 February 2020 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 23 February 2020 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 JANUARY 2004.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NOTTING HILL BOROUGH, GERMANY, BRAZIL AND THE USA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
INTERNATIONAL PLENITUDE MINISTRIES
80 CUMBERLAND HOUSE
SCRUBS LANE
LONDON
NW10 6RF
- Phone:
- 07540524876
- Email:
- plenitudeurope@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window