Trustees SNOWY'S NURSERY AND PRE-SCHOOL
Charity number: 1101658
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Eileen Buckley | Chair | 31 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Barker | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Webb | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Wyatt | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michaela Rowell | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Edward Richard Moseley | Trustee | 27 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Katy-Anne Moseley | Trustee | 13 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Luke Prest | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.