ST. MARY'S JUNIOR SCHOOL, CAMBRIDGE, PTA

Charity number: 1101729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £3.41k £8.09k £6.95k £12.52k £6.43k
Total expenditure £4.92k £15.38k £1.10k £5.17k £5.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A