Financial history ST PHILIP'S CE (A) PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1101828
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £9.24k £9.81k £12.18k £8.99k £4.03k
Total expenditure £8.77k £8.37k £19.11k £2.10k £2.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A