Trustees PASTOR TRAINING INTERNATIONAL
Charity number: 1102013

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEREMY MARSHALL | Chair | 07 November 2012 |
|
|
||||||
Stefan Paul Cantore | Trustee | 07 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Gavin Walker | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
||||||
ROY PROCTOR | Trustee | 03 September 2013 |
|
|||||||
Dr Kenneth Brownell | Trustee | 18 March 2013 |
|
|
||||||
MIKE TAYLOR | Trustee | 07 November 2012 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher Embleton-Smith | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.