KNOWSLEY HOUSING TRUST

Charity number: 1103644
Removed charity
Governing document
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES DATED 12 DECEMBER 2001, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 20 JUN 2002, 23 APR 2004, 5 JUL 2005 AND 1 NOV 2010. COMPANIES HOUSE REGISTERED AN AMENDMENT OF OBJECTS ON 8 NOV 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
3.1. THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE PRIMARILY IN THE BENEFIT AREA TO: 3.1.1. PROVIDE SOCIAL HOUSING, HOUSES OR HOSTELS AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES AND SERVICES FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS; 3.1.2. PROVIDE FOR AGED, DISABLED OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF HOUSES OR HOSTELS AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES AND SERVICES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS; 3.1.3. PROVIDE SERVICES, ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS TO AGED, DISABLED OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF AND PROVIDE ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS; 3.1.4. PROVIDE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS OF THE AREAS IN WHICH THE COMPANY OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK AND NEIGHBOURING AREAS; 3.1.5. RELIEVE POVERTY AMONGST THE RESIDENTS OF THE AREAS IN WHICH THE COMPANY OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK AND NEIGHBOURING AREAS; 3.1.6. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; 3.2. THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (AND IN PARTICULAR IN AREAS IN WHICH THE COMPANY OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK) BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 3.2.1. THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP: A) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS; OR B) TO EXISTING BUSINESSES; 3.2.2. THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS, AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS; 3.2.3. THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES; 3.2.4. THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE; 3.2.5. THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT; 3.2.6. THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE; 3.2.7. THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME; AND 3.2.8. SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE REGULATOR AND THE CHARITY COMMISSION FOR ENGLAND AND WALES.
Organisation type
Charitable company
Registration history
  • 07 May 2004 : registered
  • 06 February 2019 : removed (TRANSFERRED TO EXEMPT CHY)
Other names

No other names

What the charity did
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helped
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helped
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services