Accounts and annual returns ST TERESA'S CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER FRIEND ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1102674
Charity reporting is overdue by 355 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 355 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 355 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 21 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 18 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 09 July 2019 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required