Accounts and annual returns NOTTINGHAMSHIRE SEXUAL VIOLENCE SUPPORT SERVICES LTD

Charity number: 1103071
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window