Financial history NOTTINGHAMSHIRE SEXUAL VIOLENCE SUPPORT SERVICES LTD

Charity number: 1103071
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £747.79k £916.92k £1.10m £1.11m £1.71m
Total expenditure £717.56k £833.71k £1.02m £1.11m £1.58m
Income from government contracts £580.34k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £915.68k £1.10m £1.11m £1.71m
Income - Donations and legacies £295.10k £666.24k £858.13k £770.12k £1.30m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £452.12k £0 £0 £335.44k £411.38k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £979 £282
Income - Other £567 £250.68k £239.70k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £706.34k £833.71k £1.02m £1.11m £1.58m
Expenditure - Raising funds £11.22k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £1.44k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0