Trustees TENTERDEN LEISURE CENTRE TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 1103179
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Jack Fulford Brissenden | Trustee | 11 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Emma Clark | Trustee | 11 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Philip Finch | Trustee | 11 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amy Elizabeth Gardner | Trustee | 14 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew St John Roberts | Trustee | 14 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham Paul Smith | Trustee | 28 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Justin Philip Huntly Nelson | Trustee | 16 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE KATE WEST | Trustee | 24 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE LORRAINE NEWICK | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.