Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS ASSOCIATION OF BARFORD SCHOOL

Charity number: 1104308
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 12 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 July 2021 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 02 July 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 20 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 09 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required